Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/26/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/27/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/27/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/27/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/13/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/25/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/25/2010