Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/12/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/28/2010