There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Birth Parent Assistance Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to provide services for birth parents who have placed a child for adoption, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/12/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/12/2009Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/23/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/01/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/04/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/08/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/17/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/12/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1505.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1505. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/2009)

Birth Parent Assistance Act of 2009 - Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services to provide certain services for birth parents who have placed a child for adoption, either directly or by grant to or contract with state or local governmental entities or public or private agencies or organizations, including licensed child welfare or adoption agencies or adoptive family groups and faith-based organizations.

Specifies such services for birth parents as: (1) post-legal adoption services; (2) individual, group, and family counseling; and (3) training of mental health professionals, social workers, and staff at hospitals and other appropriate birth care facilities relating to their interaction with birth parents and adoptive families.