Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/23/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/01/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/04/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/08/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/17/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2010