There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Daniel Webster Congressional Clerkship Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to House

Daniel Webster Congressional Clerkship Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Daniel Webster Congressional Clerkship Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Daniel Webster Congressional Clerkship Program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/31/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 42 (Roll no. 173).(text: CR H4189)
03/30/2009Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-65.
01/06/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
04/01/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
03/31/2009-4:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/31/2009-4:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 42 (Roll no. 173). (text: CR H4189)
03/31/2009-4:26pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4198)
03/31/2009-3:20pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/31/2009-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 151.
03/31/2009-3:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4189-4190)
03/31/2009-3:12pmHouseMr. Brady (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/30/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 29.
03/30/2009HouseReported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-65.
03/25/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/25/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/06/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
01/06/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/28/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/28/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/06/2009 Referred to
03/25/2009 Markup by
03/30/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-65
Senate Rules and Administration04/01/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.151. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/31/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Daniel Webster Congressional Clerkship Act of 2009 - Establishes the Daniel Webster Congressional Clerkship Program for the appointment of individuals who are graduates of accredited law schools to serve as Congressional Clerks in the Senate or House of Representatives.

Requires the Senate Committee on Rules and Administration and the House Committee on House Administration to each select at least six individuals for a one-year term to serve as employees in their respective chambers.

Specifies eligibility criteria for a Congressional Clerk, including that the selected candidate be a graduate of such a law school as of the starting date of his or her clerkship.

Requires the committees to ensure that Congressional Clerks selected under this Act are apportioned equally between majority and minority party offices.

Entitles each clerk selected to the same compensation as, and comparable benefits to, an individual who holds the position of a judicial clerkship for the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia within three months of graduating from law school.

Authorizes appropriations.