There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase, effective as of December 1, 2009, the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain service-connected disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/30/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5779)
03/26/2009Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-56.
03/16/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
03/31/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/30/2009-2:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/30/2009-2:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5779)
03/30/2009-2:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1513.
03/30/2009-2:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4070-4072)
03/30/2009-2:30pmHouseMrs. Halvorson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/26/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 23.
03/26/2009HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-56.
03/25/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/25/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/20/2009HouseSubcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
03/20/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/16/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/16/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/16/2009 Referred to
03/25/2009 Markup by
03/26/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-56
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/20/2009 Referred to
03/20/2009 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/31/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1513. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/30/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2009 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2009, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.