There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Benefits Tax Relief Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 1993 income tax increase on Social Security benefits.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/16/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/16/2009Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/16/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1519.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1519. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2009)

Social Security Benefits Tax Relief Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the 85 percent maximum tax rate on Social Security and Railroad Retirement benefits enacted by the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1993. Appropriates, from the general fund, to the Hospital Insurance Trust Fund amounts equal to the reduction in revenues resulting from this repeal.