Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2010