Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/19/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/24/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/16/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/16/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010