Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/16/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/24/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/24/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/26/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/31/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/31/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/31/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/01/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/01/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/04/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/06/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/06/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/06/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/07/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/20/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/02/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/04/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/08/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/12/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/15/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/19/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/07/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/09/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/24/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/22/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/26/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/06/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/14/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/14/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/22/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/22/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/13/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/17/2010