Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/04/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/04/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/04/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/12/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/20/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/20/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/25/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/07/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/28/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/28/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/29/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/02/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/03/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/06/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/10/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/12/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/12/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/13/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/21/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/21/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/21/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/22/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 02/25/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/02/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/16/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/11/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/29/2010