Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/08/2009