Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/28/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/07/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/01/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2010