Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/07/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/30/2010