Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/18/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/18/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/18/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/01/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/01/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/01/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/11/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/12/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/02/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/10/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/12/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/07/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/09/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/09/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/09/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/10/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/13/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/13/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/16/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/16/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/16/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/28/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/29/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/29/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/03/2009