Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/22/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/29/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/13/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/13/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/13/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/20/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/21/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/26/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/27/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/29/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/01/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/01/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/01/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/01/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/07/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/16/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/21/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/21/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/16/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/18/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/30/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/10/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/01/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/01/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/21/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/22/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew