Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/22/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/22/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/26/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/27/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/28/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/02/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/02/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/02/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/02/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/09/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/02/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/09/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/11/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/13/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/28/2009