Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/23/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/01/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/23/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/05/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/18/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/18/2009