Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/30/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/27/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/29/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/29/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/05/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/05/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/05/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/05/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/05/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/05/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/06/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/06/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/11/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/11/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/11/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 05/15/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/19/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 06/08/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/17/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 10/22/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/02/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/02/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/02/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/03/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 02/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/24/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/24/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2010