Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/30/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/18/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/18/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/03/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/26/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/24/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/22/2010