There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop the Congressional Pay Raise Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent Members of Congress from receiving any automatic pay adjustment in 2010.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/06/2009Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2009Referred to House Administration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2009Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2009Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E9)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (118)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/07/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/07/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/07/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/09/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/09/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/09/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/14/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/14/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/21/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/23/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/26/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/27/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/02/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/02/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/02/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/02/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/04/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/09/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 02/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/11/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/09/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/19/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration01/06/2009 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform01/06/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.156. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/2009)

Stop the Congressional Pay Raise Act - Declares that no automatic pay adjustment shall be considered to have taken effect in FY2010 in the rates of basic pay for Members of Congress under the General Schedule (thus eliminating the pay adjustment for Members for such fiscal year).