Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/24/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/30/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/20/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/29/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/06/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/29/2010