Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/18/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/19/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/19/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/19/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/19/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/02/2009