Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/11/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/17/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/17/2010