Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/25/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/19/2010