Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/16/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/21/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/21/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/26/2010