Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/24/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/06/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/23/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/24/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/26/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/09/2010