Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/23/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/23/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/25/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/01/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/01/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/01/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/01/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/01/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/27/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/15/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/24/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/28/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 11/18/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/12/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/12/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 01/15/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/21/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/21/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/20/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/20/2010