Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/26/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/26/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/26/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/02/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/02/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/15/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/17/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/27/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/06/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/10/2010