Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/28/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/28/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/23/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/07/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/16/2010