Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/09/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/09/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/27/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/27/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/04/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/10/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/11/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/24/2009