There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Segal AmeriCorps Education Award Tax Relief Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide an exclusion from gross income for AmeriCorps educational awards.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/18/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/18/2009Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/01/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/01/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/01/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/24/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/24/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/01/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/28/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/24/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/18/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1596.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1596. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/18/2009)

Segal AmeriCorps Education Award Tax Relief Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income for income tax purposes AmeriCorps educational awards awarded under the National and Community Service Act of 1990.