Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/01/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/01/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/01/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/24/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/24/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/01/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/28/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/24/2010