Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/07/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/07/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/07/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/07/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/08/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/08/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/09/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/13/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/13/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/21/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/09/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/03/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2009