Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/02/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2009