Committees: H.R.1612 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/19/2009 Referred to
06/10/2009 Markup by
10/23/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-312
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands03/23/2009 Referred to
04/02/2009 Hearings by
06/10/2009 Discharged from
House Agriculture03/19/2009 Referred to
10/23/2009 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry04/23/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor03/19/2009 Referred to
10/23/2009 Discharged from
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities05/14/2009 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/26/2010 Referred to
07/21/2010 Markup by
09/27/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-323