Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/01/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/14/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/14/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/15/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/17/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/18/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/08/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/08/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/10/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/10/2009