Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/21/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/08/2009