Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/30/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/14/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/11/2010