There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Children's Health Protection Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title I of the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974, title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act, and the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to prohibit preexisting condition exclusions for children in group health plans and health insurance coverage in the group and individual markets.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/19/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/14/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
03/23/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/19/2009Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2009Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2009Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2009Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (96)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/21/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/19/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/23/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor03/19/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions05/14/2009 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/19/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1619. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/2009)

Children's Health Protection Act of 2009 - Amends the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), the Public Health Service Act, and the Internal Revenue Code to prohibit a group health plan from imposing any preexisting condition exclusion for individuals who have not attained 25 years of age.

Applies such requirement to coverage offered in the individual market.