Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/21/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/21/2010