Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/28/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/10/2010