Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/26/2009