Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/31/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/31/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/21/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/18/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/09/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/21/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/21/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/22/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/06/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/06/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/29/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/13/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/16/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/24/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/24/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/13/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/10/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/28/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 11/16/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/16/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/29/2010