Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
05/07/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-16.
05/07/2009 Signed by President.
04/30/2009 Presented to President.
04/27/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4763)
04/22/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4665)
03/19/2009 Introduced in House