Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/02/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/23/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/11/2010