Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/26/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/26/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/26/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/10/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/23/2009