Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/25/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/30/2009