Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/23/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/25/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/25/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/30/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/31/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/01/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/01/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/29/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/09/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/11/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/16/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/13/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/23/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/21/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/21/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2010