Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 03/23/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/18/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/15/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/11/2010